Cooley v. Streeter et al

Plaintiff: Charles E. Cooley, Jr.
Defendant: Christopher A. Earl, C. Arthur, Jermaine Bullard, William Streeter, Alfie Peacheco and Lisa Dixion
Case Number: 1:2018cv00540
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 Partial Filing fee: $ 25.00, receipt number 46031049606 - Ref to MJ/Nelson (PSU) (tgw)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order extending the deadline for Plaintiff to pay the $1.00 partial filing fee to 3/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/15/2019. Copy of Order & Doc. 5 mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU) (tgw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address to Kilby by Charles E. Cooley, Jr (tgw)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. (skb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Charles E. Cooley, Jr. re #5 Order. (Order was remailed to Plaintiff at new address on 1/14/19 - see doc. 6) (tgw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address and request for copy of order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. (skb) Copy of Order on IFP mailed to Defendant.
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order GRANTING #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. as set out. If the fee is timely received, the Clerk is directed to forward this action for review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 01/10/2019. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff. Modified on 1/11/2019 (tgw).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order DIRECTING Plaintiff to file #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on the Court's form or pay the $400 filing fee on or before 2/1/2019. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 01/02/2019. (srd) Copies mailed to Plaintiff.
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (skb)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against C. Arthur, Jermaine Bullard, Lisa Dixion, Christopher A. Earl, Alfie Peacheco, William Streeter, filed by Charles E. Cooley, Jr. - Ref MJ/Nelson (PSU). (skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Streeter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Cooley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfie Peacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Dixion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?