Peeples v. Mobile County Metro Jail et al

Plaintiff: Mario Andjuan Peeples
Defendant: Mobile County Metro Jail and Mobile Police Dept.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00541
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Kristi K DuBose
1 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will have a final chance to comply with the Court's prior order and pay the filing fee or file an amended IFP motion no later than 2/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 02/06/2019. (Copy of order, IFP form and order (doc. 4) mailed to Plaintiff as directed) (nah)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file an amended IFP motion no later than 1/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 01/09/2019. (Copy of order and IFP form mailed to Plaintiff) (nah)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Andjuan Peeples - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (nah)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Plaintiff to pay the filing fee or to file a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 2/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 01/03/2019. (Copy of Order and IFP form mailed to Plaintiff) (nah)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Mobile County Metro Jail and Mobile Police Dept. filed by Mario Andjuan Peeples - Ref MJ/Nelson (PSU). (skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peeples v. Mobile County Metro Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Metro Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Andjuan Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?