Holmes v. Mobile Work Release et al

Plaintiff: Arthur Wade Holmes
Defendant: Lt Travis, Sgt. Randolph, Captain Folks, Mobile Work Release and Warden Lightner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00006
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00998. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 4, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/11/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 4 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's #3 recommendation is adopted; (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama; DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/4/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/11/2019.]
December 28, 2018 NO OBJECTION filed to #3 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. (dmn, )(NO PDF) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/11/2019.]
December 4, 2018 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/4/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/11/2019.]
November 29, 2018 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Arthur Wade Holmes. (beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/11/2019.]
November 29, 2018 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Captain Folks, Warden Lightner, Mobile Work Release, Sgt. Randolph, Lt Travis, filed by Arthur Wade Holmes.(beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Mobile Work Release et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Wade Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Folks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Work Release
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?