The City of Fairhope, Alabama v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The City of Fairhope, Alabama
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Reply to #9 Response to #5 Motion to Remand to Judge Moorer. (mab)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to #9 Response to #5 Motion to Remand, filed by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. (McCormick, Jason) Modified on 2/21/2019 (mab).
February 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Moorer. (tot)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Newton, Candace)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order, GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Supplement. Defendant Charter Oak's deadline for responding to the motion to remand is extended to February 13, 2019. Any reply by Plaintiff is due no later than February 20, 2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 01/31/2019. (mab)
January 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Supplement to #5 Motion to Remand Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Supplement to #5 Motion to Remand by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order) (McCormick, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #5 Motion to Remand filed by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. Defendant's response is due by February 6, 2019. Plaintiff's reply is due by February 13, 2019. Motion to be taken under submission on February 14, 2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/16/2019. (mab)
January 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Remand Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by The City of Fairhope, Alabama. (McCormick, Jason)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER [TEXT ONLY] on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/14/2019. (ctn)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Newton, Candace)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Newton, Candace)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company from Baldwin County, case number CV-2019-900032.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2331489, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Newton, Candace) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Fairhope, Alabama v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Fairhope, Alabama
Represented By: Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Jason S. McCormick
Represented By: Marcus E. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Candace Hudson Newton
Represented By: Joel S. Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?