The Bank of New York Mellon v. 251 Gotham LLC

Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: James F. Padilla, 251 Gotham LLC and Kathy LaFortune
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
1 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #23 Memorandum in Opposition to Judge Steele. (mbp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Transfer Only in the Alternative filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Humeniuk, Stephen)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER [TEXT ONLY] on #20 Disclosure Statement filed by 251 Gotham LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/14/2019. (ctn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by 251 Gotham LLC. (Steele, William)
February 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #20 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant 251 Gotham LLC. (Anderson, Mark)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER [TEXT ONLY]: 251 Gotham LLC is ORDERED to file a Disclosure Statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Wed. 2/20/2019 (form available at: www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/13/2019. (ctn)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for other relief filed by 251 Gotham LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2019, Replies due by 3/20/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/12/2019. (tgw)
February 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Transfer Only in the Alternative to Judge Steele (tgw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Sanctions , MOTION to Transfer Only in the Alternative by 251 Gotham LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Summons & Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Answer, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Opposition to Motion, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Reply to Motion, #9 Exhibit I - State Court Order to Show Cause, #10 Exhibit J - Rule 11 Letter) (Anderson, Mark)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Mark Steven Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for 251 Gotham LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/30/2019. (ctn)
January 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Mark Steven Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2340440, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Mark Steven Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2340440, Online Credit Card Payment.) by 251 Gotham LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion) (Anderson, Mark)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to 251 Gotham LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by The Bank of New York Mellon (Humeniuk, Stephen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND RELATED RELIEF against 251 Gotham LLC, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Humeniuk, Stephen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to 251 Gotham LLC, Kathy LaFortune, James F. Padilla. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by The Bank of New York Mellon (Attachments: #1 251 Gotham Summons, #2 LaFortune Summons) (Humeniuk, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Stephen J. Humeniuk to Appear Pro Hac Vice for The Bank of New York Mellon; granting #4 MOTION for Thomas A. Connop to Appear Pro Hac Vice for The Bank of New York Mellon; granting #5 MOTION for Michael DeSimone to Appear Pro Hac Vice for The Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/15/2019. (ctn)
January 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Stephen J. Humeniuk to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 MOTION for Thomas A. Connop to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 MOTION for Michael DeSimone to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Service Order entered 1/14/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/25/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 01/14/2019. (nah)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER [TEXT ONLY] on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/14/2019. (ctn)
January 12, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Steele, William)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Michael DeSimone to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2331552, Online Credit Card Payment.) by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Supplement) (nah).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Thomas A. Connop to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2331550, Online Credit Card Payment.) by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Supplement) (nah).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Stephen J. Humeniuk to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2331542, Online Credit Card Payment.) by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Humeniuk, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Supplement) (nah).
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff The Bank of New York Mellon. (Humeniuk, Stephen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND RELATED RELIEF against 251 Gotham LLC, Kathy LaFortune, James F. Padilla ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2331487, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Humeniuk, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. 251 Gotham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 251 Gotham LLC
Represented By: Mark Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy LaFortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Stephen Humeniuk
Represented By: Thomas Connop
Represented By: Michael P. De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?