State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, GRANTING #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas C. Heuvel. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 03/11/2019. (mab)
March 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Notice of Filing Exhibits certificate of good standing by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re: #11 Motion for Douglas C. Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (mab)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits certificate of good standing by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re: #11 MOTION for Douglas C. Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2364270, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Heuvel, Douglas)
March 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Douglas C. Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2364270, Online Credit Card Payment.) with application and Certificate of Good Standing from State Bar of Texas attached (need Certificate of Good Standing from federal court); Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Douglas C. Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2364270, Online Credit Card Payment.) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (Heuvel, Douglas)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 03/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 consent form) (mab)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #8 , #5 Corporate Disclosure Statements filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and filed by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 02/11/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Cash, Regina)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order, It is ORDERED that on or before February 15, 2019 by 5:00 p.m., State Farm Fire and Casualty Company shall file its disclosure statement, or SHOW CAUSE why it has failed to comply with Civil L.R. 7.1. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 02/08/2019. (Attachment: #1 blank disclosure statement form) (mab)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Cash, Regina)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. (Prater, Harlan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (stamped state court notice) by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Prater, Harlan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement form emailed to Defendant BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, and Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; Disclosure Statements Due pursuant to Civil L.R. 7.1 by 2/1/2019. (mab)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. (Prater, Harlan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2018-903169.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2338624, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings) (Prater, Harlan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Regina Ford Cash
Represented By: Douglas Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Anthony Lane Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?