McCants v. City of Fairhope, Alabama
Plaintiff: Patrick McCants
Defendant: City of Fairhope, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 46031049878 (tgw)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to pay the $400 Filing Fee by 3/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/28/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick McCants - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU) (tgw)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to file an IFP motion on this Court's form by 2/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/6/2019. Copy of Order & IFP motion mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick McCants - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Fairhope, Alabama filed by Patrick McCants. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCants v. City of Fairhope, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairhope, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?