Thomas v. Ashton & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mario Thomas
Defendant: Ashton & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00048
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 REFERRAL OF #4 Notice or Service Attempt to Judge Moorer. (tot)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Mario Thomas re #3 Order to Show Cause Notice of Service Attempt (Fonteneau, Kira)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order DIRECTING Plaintiff to file a Notice of Service Attempt or Show Cause why he has not complied with Court's Local Rule as set out. Response due by 4/15/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/02/2019. (srd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ashton & Company, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashton & Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2345125, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mario Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Conflict Disclosure, #3 Request For Service, #4 Summons) (Fonteneau, Kira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ashton & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Thomas
Represented By: Kira Yalon Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?