Price v. Dunn et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Price
Defendant: Cynthia Stewart and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
2 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM filed by Christopher Lee Price re: #37 Notice of Appeal. Requesting transcripts for proceedings as follows: 4/4/2019 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose, Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. Email to Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. (Katz, Aaron)
April 8, 2019 Filing 39 Appeal Instructions re: #37 Notice of Appeal, #36 Notice of Appeal: The Civil Appeal Statement Form is available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. Transcript Information Form to be filed no later than 4/22/2019. (srd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 38 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #36 Notice of Appeal and #37 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: None. Judge Appealed: DuBose. Court Reporter: Melanie Wilkins. Fee Paid. (srd)
April 6, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Christopher Lee Price. ( Filing fee $505 receipt number AALSDC-2380738, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Katz, Aaron)
April 6, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Christopher Lee Price. (Katz, Aaron)
April 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER entered that the Plaintiff's Rule 60(b)(6) motion is DENIED. Plaintiff's renewed motion for preliminary injunction is also DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/6/2019. (mcb)
April 6, 2019 Filing 34 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) by Christopher Lee Price. (Katz, Aaron)
April 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Reconsideration of District Judge Order re #32 Order,, Terminate Motions, (from Judgment) by Christopher Lee Price. (Katz, Aaron)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order DENYING #29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christopher Lee Price as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 04/05/2019. (nah) (Main Document 32 replaced on 4/5/2019) (nah).
April 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2019. Motions taken under submission. Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. (mcb)
April 2, 2019 REFERRAL OF #31 Reply to Response to Motion, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
April 2, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion #29 , #28 (Defendants' Reply to Price's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Opposition to Price's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to Price's Motion for Stay of Execution) filed by Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart. (Simpson, Lauren)
April 2, 2019 REFERRAL OF #30 Notice of Supplemental Authority to Judge DuBose. (nah)
April 1, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Christopher Lee Price (of Supplemental Authority) (Katz, Aaron)
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to the State's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Katz, #3 Affidavit Palombi, #4 Affidavit Kennedy) (Katz, Aaron)
March 29, 2019 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Katz, Aaron)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan R. Ference-Burke. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/7/19. (lto)
March 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 MOTION for Jonathan R. Ference-Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Jonathan R. Ference-Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2364267, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission Form, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ference-Burke, Jonathan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order GRANTING #20 MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Christopher Lee Price. The Court further finds that Defendants' motion for a protective order prohibiting discovery is DENIED. Because time is of the essence in this action, Defendants are ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories on or before 3/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 03/06/2019. (nah)
March 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, REFERRAL OF #22 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order and #23 Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
March 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #23 Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel to Judge DuBose. (nah)
March 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #22 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order to Judge DuBose. (nah)
March 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Judge DuBose (nah)
March 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Judge DuBose (nah)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Jackson Hughes on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart (Hughes, Beth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Christopher Lee Price re: #20 MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #23 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/2/19 Email from Katz to AAG Simpson and AAG Johnson) (Katz, Aaron)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (State's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order) filed by Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Simpson, Lauren)
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Mitchell Johnson on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Johnson, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Katz, Aaron)
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Simpson, Lauren)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order setting briefing schedule as follows: Defendants motion for summary judgment due by 3/8/2019; Plaintiff response in opposition due by 3/29/2019; Defendants reply brief due by 4/2/2019. The Court will take the motion under submission on 4/3/2019. Oral argument on the motion for summary judgment set for 4/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. The Alabama Supreme Court has scheduled an execution date for 4/11/2019. Upon Plaintiff's timely filing of a motion to stay, the Defendants will have seven days within which to respond. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 03/01/2019. (nah)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Status Conference. Status conference held via telephone on 02/28/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 03/01/2019. (nah)
March 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #16 Notice of Execution Date to Judge DuBose. (nah)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart (Defendants' Notice of Execution Date) (Attachments: #1 ASCT Order setting execution date) (Simpson, Lauren)
February 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2019. Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. (nah)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Michael Coriell terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/27/19. (Murray, P.)
February 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION for David M. Coriell to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for David M. Coriell to Withdraw as Attorney by Christopher Lee Price. (Coriell, David)
February 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Status Conference (Time Sensitive) to Judge DuBose (nah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Status Conference (Time Sensitive) by Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Captain Jeff Pemberton) (Simpson, Lauren)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart. (Simpson, Lauren)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron M. Katz. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/19/19. (lto)
February 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Aaron M. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Aaron M. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2351771, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Coriell, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ashley Simpson on behalf of Jefferson S. Dunn (Simpson, Lauren)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Coriell. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/13/19. (lto)
February 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for David M. Coriell to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for David M. Coriell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2349226, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Coriell, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Admission Letter as to David Michael Coriell; Admission Application due by 2/20/2019. (nah)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Admission Letter as to Aaron M. Katz ; Admission Application due by 2/20/2019. (nah)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Defendants to file a response to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 3/11/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 02/11/2019. (Copy mailed to Defendants at addresses provided in Summons) (nah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jefferson S. Dunn, Cynthia Stewart. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Christopher Lee Price (Coriell, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2347012, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Christopher Lee Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coriell, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Price
Represented By: Aaron M. Katz
Represented By: David Michael Coriell
Represented By: Jonathan R Ference-Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stewart
Represented By: Beth Jackson Hughes
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Represented By: Beth Jackson Hughes
Represented By: Henry Mitchell Johnson
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?