Master Marine, Inc. v. M/V Gee's Bend Ferry et al
Plaintiff: Master Marine, Inc.
Defendant: M/V Gee's Bend Ferry and HMS Ferries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00065
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #9 Counterclaim by Master Marine, Inc.. (Kavanagh, John)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by M/V Gee's Bend Ferry. It is ORDERED Plaintiff shall file its response by 4/23/2019 and Defendant shall file any reply by 4/30/2019 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/01/2019. (srd)
April 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #15 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. McCarthy on behalf of M/V Gee's Bend Ferry (McCarthy, Brian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by M/V Gee's Bend Ferry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael D. Wilson, #2 Exhibit Repair Agreement) (Newman, J.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement,,,, #13 filed by HMS Ferries, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants HMS Ferries, Inc., Hornblower Group, LLC, HMS Global Maritime, LLC, HMS Consulting and Technical, LLC, Seaward Services, Inc., Hornblower Group, Inc., Hornblower Yachts, LLC, Alcatraz Cruises, LLC, Statue Cruises, LLC, HNY Ferry, LLC, Hornblower Cable Cars, Inc, Hornblower Canadian Holdings, Inc., Counter Claimants HMS Ferries, Inc., Hornblower Group, LLC, HMS Global Maritime, LLC, HMS Consulting and Technical, LLC, Seaward Services, Inc., Hornblower Group, Inc., Hornblower Yachts, LLC, Alcatraz Cruises, LLC, Statue Cruises, LLC, HNY Ferry, LLC, Hornblower Cable Cars, Inc, Hornblower Canadian Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hornblower Group, LLC, Corporate Parent HMS Global Maritime, LLC, Other Affiliate HMS Consulting and Technical, LLC, Other Affiliate Seaward Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Alcatraz Cruises, LLC, Other Affiliate Statue Cruises, LLC, Other Affiliate HNY Ferry, LLC, Other Affiliate Hornblower Canadian Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Hornblower Cable Cars, Inc, Other Affiliate Hornblower Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Hornblower Yachts, LLC for HMS Ferries, Inc., HMS Ferries, Inc... (Zimmern, Benjamin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 Blank Disclosure Statement form e-Mailed to Defendant HMS Ferries, Inc.; Disclosure Statement Due 3/19/2019 pursuant to Civil L.R. 7.1. (mab)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake T. Richardson on behalf of Master Marine, Inc. (Richardson, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Answer to #9 Counterclaim due from Master Marine, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 12(a)(1)(B). (mab)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/26/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 03/13/2019. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Master Marine, Inc. by HMS Ferries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Standard Vessel Repair Agreement) (Zimmern, Benjamin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Master Marine, Inc.. M/V Gee's Bend Ferry served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019 (Kavanagh, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to M/V Gee's Bend Ferry. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Master Marine, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Master Marine, Inc.. (Kavanagh, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Master Marine, Inc.. HMS Ferries, Inc. served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019 (Kavanagh, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Master Marine, Inc. (Kavanagh, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HMS Ferries, Inc. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Verified Complaint against HMS Ferries, Inc., M/V Gee's Bend Ferry ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2349014, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Master Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ed Holland, #2 Exhibit B - Pro Forma Invoice, #3 Exhibit C - Change Orders, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Kavanagh, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Master Marine, Inc. v. M/V Gee's Bend Ferry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Gee's Bend Ferry
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Brian P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS Ferries, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Zimmern
Represented By: Michael Travis Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Master Marine, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?