Fitchhorn et al v. Jay's Landscaping and Custom Lawn Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Duffield, Joshua Fitchhorn and Benjamin Pollgreen
Defendant: John "Jay" Eubanks, Jr. and Jay's Landscaping and Custom Lawn Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order, Plfs are to file their notice of service attempt or show cause why they have not complied w/the requirement on or before 5/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/25/19. (tot)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/08/2019. (srd)
March 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Mary Bubbett Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (tot)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Mary Bubbett Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2367639, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Christopher Duffield, Joshua Fitchhorn, Benjamin Pollgreen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Application for Admission PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Jody)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John "Jay" Eubanks, Jr., Jay's Landscaping and Custom Lawn Service, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2359205, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FLSA Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jackson, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitchhorn et al v. Jay's Landscaping and Custom Lawn Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John "Jay" Eubanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay's Landscaping and Custom Lawn Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Duffield
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Represented By: Mary Bubbett Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Fitchhorn
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Represented By: Mary Bubbett Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Pollgreen
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Represented By: Mary Bubbett Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?