Clark v. Alabama Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Daniel Bartholomew Clark
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv00140
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-01062. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 18, 2019 Case transferred to the Southern District of Alabama; ELECTRONICALLY transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The magistrate judge's #4 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the U.S District Court for the Southern District of AL pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a); 3) All pending motions are left for resolution by the transferee court; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/18/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement by Daniel Bartholomew Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Court Order by Daniel Bartholomew Clark. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
March 6, 2019 No objections filed to the #4 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge this case be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/14/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Daniel Bartholomew Clark. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 1/31/2019, Plf shall file either the $400.00 filing/administrative fees or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/17/2019. (Copy of IFP form mailed to Plf as directed) (Furnished: Cashier) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Daniel Bartholomew Clark.(NO IFP. NO FILING FEE). (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bartholomew Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?