Jackson Supply Company v. 7 General Contracting, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jackson Supply Company
Defendant: Toni S. Mason, 7 General Contracting, Inc., Heath Mason and Tally S. White
Case Number: 1:2019cv00150
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re: #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jackson Supply Company. Responses due by 7/17/2019, Replies due by 7/24/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/3/2019. (tgw)
July 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings to Judge Steele (tgw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jackson Supply Company. (Rogers, Kevin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jackson Supply Company. (Rogers, Kevin)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Tally S. White. (Harred, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by 7 General Contracting, Inc., Heath Mason, Toni S. Mason. (Holifield, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Supply Company. Tally S. White served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019 (Rogers, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S. Holifield on behalf of 7 General Contracting, Inc., Heath Mason, Toni S. Mason (Holifield, Jennifer)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Supply Company. Toni S. Mason served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019 (Rogers, Kevin) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/8/2019) (tgw).
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Supply Company. Heath Mason served on 5/6/2019, answer due 6/10/2019 (Rogers, Kevin) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/8/2019) (tgw).
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jackson Supply Company. Heath Mason waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 7 General Contracting, Inc., Heath Mason, Toni S. Mason, Tally S. White. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jackson Supply Company (Rogers, Kevin)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 3/27/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/13/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/27/2019. (tgw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 7 General Contracting, Inc., Heath Mason, Toni S. Mason, Tally S. White ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2375041, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jackson Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4-5-10 Trade Credit Application, #2 Exhibit B - 2-29-12 Trade Credit Application, #3 Exhibit C - Merger Docs, #4 Exhibit D - Merger Docs, #5 Exhibit E - Statement, #6 Exhibit F - Loni Duncan Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 1 - 2-2-17 Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit 2 - 9-13-17 Executed Addendum, #9 Exhibit 3 - 1-31-18 Second Addendum, #10 Exhibit 4 - 10-9-18 Third Addendum, #11 Exhibit G - Consent to Judgment, #12 Exhibit H - 2-1-17 Personal Guarantee) (Rogers, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2019: #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Supply Company v. 7 General Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Supply Company
Represented By: Kevin Alan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni S. Mason
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 General Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Mason
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tally S. White
Represented By: James Kyle Harred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?