English-Eldell v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Cora E. English-Eldell
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #11 Motion for Kenneth Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/9/2019. (bld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Kenneth Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2427522, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Cora E. English-Eldell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Wilson, Kenneth) Modified on 7/10/2019 (tot).
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT (Attorney Keegan Owen,Owen Keegan for Nancy A. Berryhill added). Social Security Brief due by 8/2/2019. (Owen, Keegan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Owen, Keegan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE SSA, Office of the General Counsel, served 04/05/2019. (srd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy A. Berryhill served c/o U.S. Attorney on 4/4/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (srd)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/03/2019. (srd) Copy to parties.
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (SSA, U.S. Attny Gen, & U.S. Attny). Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipts).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cora E. English-Eldell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/03/2019. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cora E. English-Eldell. (Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/2/19) (tot)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Cora E. English-Eldell. (Referred to MJ/Bivins on 4/2/19) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English-Eldell v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora E. English-Eldell
Represented By: Kenneth Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Represented By: Owen Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?