Shears v. Symetra Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Cassandra Shears
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00161
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: STATUS REPORT (Joint) #19 (ctn)
June 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #19 Status Report to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order staying this matter pending the resolution of the #2 Motion to Dismiss. The parties are directed to file a Status Report by 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/4/2019. (tgw)
June 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2019. This matter will be stayed pending disposition of motion to dismiss/strike. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srr)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 6/4/2019 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/21/2019. (tgw)
May 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Yeilding, Christopher)
April 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Reply Brief to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike MOTION to Strike filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
April 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, #13 Brief in Support of Response in Opposition to Judge Nelson. (tgw)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Brief in Support of #12 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Cassandra Shears. (Wolfe, Mark) Modified on 4/23/2019 (tgw).
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike MOTION to Strike filed by Cassandra Shears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5) (Wolfe, Mark)
April 22, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Response to Notice of Removal to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cassandra Shears. (Wolfe, Mark)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/16/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Symetra Life Insurance Company is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and/or S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Thurs. 4/18/2019 (form available at: www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/11/2019. (ctn)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/23/2019, Replies due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/9/2019. (tgw)
April 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 Brief to Judge Nelson. (skb)
April 8, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss #2 and Motion to Strike referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (jlr)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
April 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tgw)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 Brief filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Yeilding, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Yeilding, Christopher). Added MOTION to Strike on 4/3/2019 (tgw).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Symetra Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-cv-2019-900584. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2377706, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Yeilding, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shears v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Lynch Yeilding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Shears
Represented By: Mark C. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?