Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC v. Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00173
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). No order will be entered. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F. 3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012) (nah)
June 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (nah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC. (Irvine, George)
May 24, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Notice of Settlement to Judge DuBose. (nah)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC (Irvine, George)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Starnet Insurance Company, Inc. A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Starnet Insurance Company, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 04/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Spencer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 StarNet Insurance Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Spencer)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Starnet Insurance Company, Inc. from Circuit Court of Escambia County, Alabama, case number CV-2019-900031. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2378304, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court File in Circuit Court of Escambia County, Alabama, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lorraine Karas with Attachments 1-3, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Eric A. Crawford with Exhibits 1 and 2, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Taylor, Spencer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC v. Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Represented By: Aaron Nicholas maples
Represented By: John Bradford Boyd Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starnet Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer M. Taylor
Represented By: R. Bruce Barze, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?