McConnell v. American General Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Brian McConnell
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00174
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Defendant American General Life Insurance Company reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Steele, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants American General Life Insurance Company, American International Grop identifying Corporate Parent American International Grop for American General Life Insurance Company.. (Wahlheim, William)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/28/2019. (Steele, William)
June 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Steele (tgw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Brian McConnell. (Wahlheim, William)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian McConnell. American General Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Soloway, Daniel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on American General Life Insurance Company on 04/29/2019, filed by Brian McConnell. (Soloway, Daniel)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 4/5/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/20/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/5/2019. (tgw)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American General Life Insurance Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian McConnell ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2378953, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Brian McConnell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Soloway, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton Scott Thrash
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McConnell
Represented By: Daniel M. Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?