Boswell v. DeMouey et al

Plaintiff: Gary Boswell
Defendant: Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services and Richard Eugene DeMouey, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00181
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Murray. (tgw)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order: On May 21, 2019, Jordan Reeves Brooks and Wm. Gantt Pierce, attorneys for Plaintiff, filed a Motion to Withdraw #12 . In the motion, they represent that Plaintiff "has expressed his desire to seek different counsel for this matter." Any objection to this motion must be filed on or before June 6, 2019. Plaintiff Gary Boswell is ORDERED to file a statement confirming that he wishes to discharge Mr. Brooks and Mr. Gantt and setting forth the status of his attempts to retain substitute counsel on or before June 6, 2019. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Gary Boswell at 1902 3rd Avenue, Richmond, Virginia 23222. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/23/19. (lto)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wilson, Forrest)
May 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Jordan Reeves Brooks and Wm. Gantt Pierce to Withdraw as Attorney - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tgw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Jordan Reeves Brooks and Wm. Gantt Pierce to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Boswell. (Brooks, Jordan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Richard Eugene Demouey, Jr.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Richard Eugene DeMouey, Jr. (Killion, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/15/2019) (tgw).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) Copy mailed to William Pierce & Jordan Brooks. (tgw)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services Notice of Constitutional Challenge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Filed Answer) (Lieb, Jonathan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services. (Lieb, Jonathan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services. (Steele, William)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 4/9/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court of the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/23/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/9/2019. (skb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Admission Letter mailed to Jordan Reeves Brooks. Admission Application due by 4/19/2019. (skb)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Defendant Brand Industrial Services, Inc. f/k/a Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services. (Lieb, Jonathan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lieb, Jonathan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2019-900715. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2381221, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lieb, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (skb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boswell v. DeMouey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy and Infrastructure Services
Represented By: Forrest C. Wilson, III
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Eugene DeMouey, Jr.
Represented By: James W. Killion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Boswell
Represented By: William Gantt Pierce
Represented By: Jordan Reeves Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?