INGEN1, LLC et al v. Erdman
Plaintiff: M.D. Kirby J. Plessala, Carla Williams Falkner, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, INGEN1, LLC, Clifford A. Henricksen, Peter T. Falkner and Kirby J. Plessala
Defendant: M.D. Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. and Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00183
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Gregory D. Latham to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/17/19. (tot)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Ian C. Barras to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/17/19. (tot)
June 10, 2019 REFERRAL OF #19 MOTION for Ian C. Barras to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
June 10, 2019 REFERRAL OF #20 MOTION for Gregory D. Latham to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Gregory D. Latham to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2411640, Online Credit Card Payment.) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing - Greg Latham, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Latham, Gregory)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Ian C. Barras to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number ALSDC-2411579, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Carla Williams Falkner, Peter T. Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Medical Ingenuity Partners, LLC, Deneen Territo-Evans Plessala, Kirby J. Plessala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Errata B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00414-TFM-C, 1:19-cv-00183-TFM-C (Barras, Ian)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order, designating Case No. 1:18-cv0414-TFM-C (Erdman I) as the lead case, directing parties to make any subsequent filings for the consolidated matter in Erdman I until directed otherwise, and directing parties to use header in Order for their filings in the consolidated matter. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 05/29/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00183-TFM-C, 1:18-cv-00414-TFM-C (mab) Modified on 5/30/2019 (mab).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Plf's #4 Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED as set out, & this matter is CONSOLIDATED with Erdman vs. Falkner, No. 1:18-cv-414-TFM-C, for purposes of pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/24/19. (tot)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/30/2019. (srd)
April 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. (Tufts, Lucy)
April 24, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Brief in support of #2 Motion to Seal certain documents to Judge Moorer. (mab)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Brief filed by Carla Williams Falkner, Peter T. Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Kirby J. Plessala re #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Carla Williams Falkner, Peter T. Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Kirby J. Plessala. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INGEN1, LLC, Clifford A. Henricksen, Kirby J. Plessala, Carla Williams Falkner, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Peter T. Falkner. Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019 (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC (Cassady, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC. (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order SUSPENDING #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and #5 Memorandum in Support, filed by Kirby J. Plessala, Peter T. Falkner, Carla Williams Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC pending ruling on Motion to Remand as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/09/2019. (srd)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order PROVISIONALLY GRANTING #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Kirby J. Plessala, Peter T. Falkner, Carla Williams Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC. Parties are ORDERED to file a brief in support or opposition to the motion by 4/24/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/09/2019. (srd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Blank Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to Plaintiffs INGEN1, LLC, & Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC; Disclosure Statements Due 4/15/2019. (Counsel please identify members of the limited liability corporations.) (mab)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
April 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document; and #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (1:18-cv-414-TFM-C); Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Carla Williams Falkner, Peter T. Falkner, Clifford A. Henricksen, INGEN1, LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Kirby J. Plessala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to MIS of Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to MIS of Motion to Consolidate) (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Plaintiffs. (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document by All Plaintiffs. (Satterwhite, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2381655, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Insert, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Insert, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Insert, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10) (Satterwhite, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGEN1, LLC et al v. Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Kirby J. Plessala
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Williams Falkner
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Ian Charles Barras
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Ian Charles Barras
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGEN1, LLC
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Ian Charles Barras
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Henricksen
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Ian Charles Barras
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter T. Falkner
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Ian Charles Barras
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby J. Plessala
Represented By: Harry V. Satterwhite
Represented By: Ian Charles Barras
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Wendell Erdman, Jr.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?