Shields v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Paul Edward Shields, Jr.
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00184
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT (Attorney Jillian Nelson,Jillian Erin Nelson for Nancy Berryhill added). Social Security Brief due by 8/8/2019. (Nelson, Jillian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nancy Berryhill. (Nelson, Jillian)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 4/15/2019 as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (skb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney's Office served on 4/11/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (skb)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/10/2019. (srd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2019: #1 Cert Mail Receipt) (srd).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to serve the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/10/2019. (srd)
April 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (mab)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Edward Shields, Jr. (Thomas, Ashley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Paul Edward Shields, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Jillian Nelson
Represented By: Jillian Erin Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Edward Shields, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?