Rackley v. Wholesale Home Center et al
Plaintiff: Irene Rackley
Defendant: Cappaert Manufactured Housing, Inc., Regional Enterprises, LLC and Wholesale Home Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00189
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 Remand Letter, Certified Docket Sheet and Order sent via Email to Circuit Court of Choctaw re #14 Order. (srd)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Choctaw County, Alabama for want of federal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 05/13/2019. (srd)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 , #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC, filed by Cappaert Manufactured Housing, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/08/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Steele, William)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Little, Justin)
May 3, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 Brief to Judge Steele. (tgw)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert Calvin Steindorff, IV on behalf of Regional Enterprises, LLC (Steindorff, Gilbert)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cappaert Manufactured Housing, Inc.. (Weber, Daniel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Brief filed by Irene Rackley . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Howell, Gordon)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon Kevin Howell on behalf of Irene Rackley (Howell, Gordon)
April 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 Supplement to the Notice of Removal to Judge Steele. (tgw)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Regional Enterprises, LLC and Cappaert Manufactured Housing, Inc. are each ordered to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and/or S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Mon. 5/6/2019 (form available at: www.alsd.uscourts.gov/sites/alsd/files/forms/CivilDisclosureStatement.pdf). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/29/2019. (ctn)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement by Defendant Regional Enterprises, LLC's Notice of Removal by Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Little, Justin).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (mbp)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered that Regional is to supplement its Notice of Removal by 4/25/19 as further set out. Plaintiff may file a brief setting forth its position by 5/2/19. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/15/19. (mbp)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Cappaert Manufactured Housing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Removal) (Weber, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regional Enterprises, LLC from Circuit Court of Choctaw County, Alabama, case number 19-900020. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2384572, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Little, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rackley v. Wholesale Home Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cappaert Manufactured Housing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Scott Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Justin Barrett Little
Represented By: Gilbert Calvin Steindorff, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Home Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Rackley
Represented By: J. Jefferson Utsey
Represented By: Gordon Kevin Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?