Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. v. Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.
Defendant: M. David Hogan, Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC, Brent Upshaw and Blake Ogilvie
Not Yet Classified: The Succession of Paul H. Hogan, William T. Hogan and Johnnie Hogan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00191
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. Bench trial to be set during month on March 2020. Discovery cutoff 12/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019. Motions due by 1/8/2020. Position Regarding Settlement due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 10, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bowron on behalf of Johnnie Hogan, William T. Hogan, The Succession of Paul H. Hogan (Bowron, Edward)
July 9, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Objections to Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
July 9, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by Johnnie Hogan, William T. Hogan, The Succession of Paul H. Hogan re #38 Notice of Filing Objection of Non-Parties Johnnie Hogan, William T. Hogan and the Succession of Paul H. Hogan to Non-Party Subpoenas Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P 45(d)(2)B (Holifield, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2019. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srr)
July 5, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #42 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Jack Rome, Jr. filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order: GRANTING #47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Jack Rome, Jr. filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC; Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019, Replies due by 7/16/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. See order for call in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/26/19. copy mailed to M David Hogan via regular & certified mail (srr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #1 certified receipt) (srr).
June 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2019. Scheduling conference will be reset - order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Jack Rome, Jr. by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
June 20, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. of Filing Initial Disclosures (Steadman, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #42 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Jack Rome, Jr. filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. Responses to the motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than Wed. 6/26/2019. Replies to the responses, if any, must be filed and served no later than Mon. 7/1/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on Tues. 7/2/2019. Once the motion is under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/20/2019. (ctn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. re: #37 Response in Opposition to Motion, #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Steadman, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Jack Rome, Jr. by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw. (Chason, Allan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order, Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. See order for call in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/17/19. (srr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 39 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Steadman, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Filing Subpoenas filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jack Rome, Jr.) (Collier, Danny)
June 12, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Request for Production filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
June 10, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Filing First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and Request for Production filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order re: #33 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw. Because all parties have consented to the undersigned conducting all proceedings in this action, there is no need to recommend to the Court that the reference to the undersigned be vacated, the undersigned will continue to conduct all proceedings in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/4/19. (srr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Brent Upshaw, Blake Ogilvie.. (Chason, Allan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement #30 filed by Brent Upshaw, Corporate Disclosure Statement #31 filed by Blake Ogilvie (Anthony, Porcha)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Blake Ogilvie. (Chason, Allan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Brent Upshaw. (Chason, Allan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw of Service on M. David Hogan of Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Chason, Allan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order GRANTING #26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Rule 26(f) Report. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/23/2019. (nah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw. (Chason, Allan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Rule 26(f) Report by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order on re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 6/13/2019. Replies to Response to S/J due by 6/28/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/17/19. (srr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 24 Brief filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Steadman, Joseph)
May 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
May 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC re #20 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Amended Notice of Removal with State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Amended Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Collier, Danny)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit 3, Documents being removed, #4 Exhibit 4, Consent to Removal) (Collier, Danny)
May 1, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order that Hogan LLC is file and serve by 5/8/19 an amended or supplemental Notice of Removal that corrects the deficiencies as set out. STRIKING #14 Amended Complaint filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to re-file a second Amended Complaint by 5/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/1/19. (srr) Modified on 5/2/2019 (srr).
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Blake Ogilvie, Brent Upshaw. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (Attachments: #1 summons upshaw) (srr)
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. Brent Upshaw (Steadman, Joseph)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. Blake Ogilvie (Steadman, Joseph)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 STRIKEN PER DOC. 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph) Modified on 5/1/2019 (srr).
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #5 , #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc., filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/19/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 04/18/2019. (nah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #8 . A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would re quire disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/17/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
April 17, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge DuBose. (nah)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC.. (Collier, Danny)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Collier, Danny)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #5 . A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (mcb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.. (Steadman, Joseph)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Collier, Danny)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by M. David Hogan (pro se) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/15/2019) (mcb). Modified on 5/1/2019 (srr).
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2019-900600.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2384978, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Record on Remand, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent to Removal) (Collier, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mcb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc. v. Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. David Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan Architectural Wood Products, LLC
Represented By: Lucian B. Hodges
Represented By: Danny J. Collier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Upshaw
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Jessica M. McDill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Ogilvie
Represented By: Allan R. Chason
Represented By: Jessica M. McDill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overseas Hardwoods Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph David Steadman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: The Succession of Paul H. Hogan
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: William T. Hogan
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Johnnie Hogan
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Edward G. Bowron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?