Axis Insurance Company v. LT Maintenance, Inc.

Plaintiff: Axis Insurance Company
Defendant: LT Maintenance, Inc.
Petitioner: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Answer due from LT Maintenance, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (tot)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Axis Insurance Company to L T Maintenance (Stutts, Eugene)
June 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 Notice of Service Attempt (Response to Order) to Judge Moorer. (tot)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #16 Order, Set Deadlines by Axis Insurance Company filed by Axis Insurance Company. (Stutts, Eugene)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order, Plf is to file its notice of service attempt or show cause why it has not complied w/the Court's Local Rule on or before 6/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/11/19. (tot)
June 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Response to Motion to Intervene to Judge Moorer. (tot)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Axis Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/5/19. (tot)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Axis Insurance Company. (Stutts, Eugene)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order VACATING Text-Only Order (Doc. 10) as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/17/19. (tot)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bradley Smith on behalf of D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham (Smith, William)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file responses to the #8 MOTION to Intervene filed by D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham no later than 6/7/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/17/19. (tot)
May 17, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 MOTION to Intervene to Judge Moorer. (tot)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor Plaintiff D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham. (Williams, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene by D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - DRH's Complaint in Intervention for Declaratory Judgment and Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - D.R. Horton Endorsement-Axis Policies, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - D.R. Horton-Axis Demand and supporting docs, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - D.R. Horton-LT Demand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - NARS 7.9.18 response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - 7.10.18 NARS and DRH response, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - D.R. Horton Request to Tender, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - NARS 11.13.18 response, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - NARS and DRH response re add'l insured, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - NARS automatic response, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - DRH 4.9.19 response, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Subcontract Agreement) (Williams, Christopher)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Axis Insurance Company (Milling, Bert)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Axis Insurance Company. (Stutts, Eugene)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order DIRECTING Plaintiff to file its Disclosure Statement or SHOW CAUSE on or before 5/3/2019. Clerk is DIRECTED to attach blank Disclosure Statement to this Order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 04/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement) (srd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LT Maintenance, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Plaintiff Axis Insurance Company; Disclosure Statement Due 4/24/2019. (tot)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Axis Insurance Company (Stutts, Eugene)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against LT Maintenance, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2386004, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Axis Insurance Company. (Stutts, Eugene) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axis Insurance Company v. LT Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axis Insurance Company
Represented By: Eugene P. Stutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham
Represented By: William Bradley Smith
Represented By: Christopher Scott Williams
Represented By: Joseph Lamar Cowan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?