American National Property and Casualty Company v. Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: American National Property and Casualty Company
Defendant: Leslie Fields, Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC and Richard Michael Collins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00198
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #26 Joint MOTION to Amend the #14 Preliminary Scheduling Order, as follows: The #14 Preliminary Scheduling Order is VACATED. The Court will enter a new preliminary scheduling order in due course, if appropriate, after disposition of the Defendants' motions to dismiss, stay, and/or abstain #12 #17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/21/2019. (ctn)
June 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #14 Preliminary Scheduling Order Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order #14 Preliminary Scheduling Order by Leslie Fields. (Cain, David)
June 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #25 Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain to Judge Nelson. (nah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion #12 Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain filed by Leslie Fields. (Wirtes, David)
June 11, 2019 REFERRAL OF #24 Response to MOTION to Dismiss Stay, and/or Abstain by Richard Michael Collins, Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC to Judge Nelson. (nah)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, and/or Abstain filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Gann, Michael)
June 4, 2019 REFERRAL OF #23 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Leslie Fields' Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain Judge Nelson. (nah)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Leslie Fields' Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Gann, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain filed by Leslie Fields and #17 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, and/or Abstain filed by Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC, Richard Michael Collins. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 6/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/04/2019. (nah)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #19 Disclosure Statement filed by Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/4/2019. (ctn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 filed by Richard Michael Collins. Review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
May 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, and/or Abstain Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC, Richard Michael Collins, Lance Smith identifying Other Affiliate Richard Michael Collins, Other Affiliate Lance Smith for Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC.. (Thetford, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Richard Michael Collins. (Thetford, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, and/or Abstain by Richard Michael Collins, Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC. (Thetford, Joseph)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain & #13 Memorandum in Support, filed by Leslie Fields. District Judge referred motion to Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. See S.D. Ala. GenLR 72(b); (5/21/2019 elec. ref.). Responses to the motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than Tues. 6/4/2019. Replies to the response(s), if any, must be filed and served no later than Tues. 6/11/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on Wed. 6/12/2019. Once the motion is under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/22/2019. (ctn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Cain, Jr on behalf of Leslie Fields (Cain, David)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
May 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain and REFERRAL OF #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss to Judge Nelson. (nah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain, #1 Complaint, Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain filed by Leslie Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Wirtes, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Stay, and/or Abstain by Leslie Fields. (Wirtes, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Wirtes, Jr on behalf of Leslie Fields (Wirtes, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gann, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC, Richard Michael Collins. Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Richard Michael Collins waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Thetford, Joseph)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Plaintiff to file and serve, no later than 5/22/2019, an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies stated in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/15/2019. (nah)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/15/2019. (ctn)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leslie Fields. Leslie Fields waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Cain, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Richard Michael Collins, Leslie Fields, Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by American National Property and Casualty Company (Gann, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. (Gann, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against American National Property and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2387560, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Gann, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Property and Casualty Company v. Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Fields
Represented By: David G. Wirtes, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Aerial, LLC
Represented By: Joseph D. Thetford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Michael Collins
Represented By: Joseph D. Thetford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael Keith Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?