Farmers Insurance Exchange et al v. Russell et al

Plaintiff: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange and Mid-Century Insurance Company
Defendant: Henry N. Russell and Henry Russell Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00210
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange. Henry Russell Insurance Agency, Inc. waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Henry N. Russell waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Harold, Edward)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Henry Russell Insurance Agency, Inc., Henry N. Russell of Execution of Waiver of Service (Irvine, George)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Truck Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 05/10/2019. (srd)
May 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Deposit Funds referred to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Truck Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-CV Statement) (Harold, Edward)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange. (Harold, Edward)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Henry Russell Insurance Agency, Inc., Henry N. Russell. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Harold, Edward)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 5/1/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/1/2019. (tgw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2392521, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of B. Selin, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement and Addendum, #3 Exhibit C - 2-1-18 Resignation, #4 Exhibit D - 2-13-18 Resignation Acknowledgment, #5 Exhibit E - 6-13-18 Violation Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harold, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Insurance Exchange et al v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry N. Russell
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Russell Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?