Bonner et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Danny Ray Bonner and Stacy Bonner
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00213
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 7/12/2019. Upon the filing of the Amended Complaint, the #5 MOTION to Dismiss will be moot. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/1/2019. (tgw)
June 24, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (srd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hess, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Reply Brief to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT TWO OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Joshua)
June 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Response to Motion to Dismiss and MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to the #5 Motion to Dismiss and, Alternatively, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Danny Ray Bonner, Stacy Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (O'Hara, Thomas) Modified on 6/4/2019 (tgw).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
May 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT TWO OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Joshua)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss COUNT TWO OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Joshua)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Milling, Bert)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hess, Joshua)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of America from Circuit Court of Choctaw County, AL, case number 15-CV-2019-900029. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2393307, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hess, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Represented By: Joshua B. Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ray Bonner
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Bonner
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?