Rampey et al v. West Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bridget Cunningham and Courtless Rampey
Defendant: Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan and West Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00220
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
2 Judge: Callie V S Granade
3 Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Wahlheim, Jr on behalf of West Corporation (Wahlheim, William)
July 1, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 MOTION to Supplement Defendants' Supplement to Partially Opposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Supplement Defendants' Supplement to Partially Opposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan, West Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
June 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan, West Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint not later than 6/28/19. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 05/31/2019. (jil) Modified on 5/31/2019 (jil).
May 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan, West Corporation. (Jackson, J.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtless Rampey, Bridget Cunningham. Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Potts, Charles)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #16 Motion for Jordan Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/13/2019. (bld)
May 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Jordan Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2397914, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Jordan Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2397914, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridget Cunningham, Courtless Rampey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Admission Form, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, Jordan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Registered Agent of West Corporation by Courtless Rampey, Bridget Cunningham. West Corporation served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019 (Potts, Charles)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #8 Motion for Lisa A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/9/2019. (bld)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #7 Motion for Mark E. Silvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/9/2019. (bld)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #6 Motion for Adam A. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/9/2019. (bld)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #5 Motion for Gregory F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/9/2019. (bld)
May 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Lisa A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #7 MOTION for Mark E. Silvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #6 MOTION for Adam A. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #5 MOTION for Gregory F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (clr) Modified on 5/8/2019 (clr).
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 Case re-assigned to District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
May 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Gregory F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 MOTION for Adam A. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #7 MOTION for Mark E. Silvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 MOTION for Lisa A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tot)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Lisa A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2395760, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridget Cunningham, Courtless Rampey. (White, Lisa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Mark E. Silvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2395756, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridget Cunningham, Courtless Rampey. (Silvey, Mark)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Adam A. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number AALSDC-2395753, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridget Cunningham, Courtless Rampey. (Edwards, Adam)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Gregory F. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number CALSDC-2395744, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Bridget Cunningham, Courtless Rampey. (Coleman, Greg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Service Notice entered 5/7/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/20/2019. (tot)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan, West Corporation. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Bridget Cunningham, Courtless Rampey (Potts, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , CLASS ACTION, against Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan, West Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2395123, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Courtless Rampey, Bridget Cunningham. (Potts, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rampey et al v. West Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Cunningham
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Lewis
Represented By: Greg Frederick Coleman
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtless Rampey
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Lewis
Represented By: Greg Frederick Coleman
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Committee of West Corporation Employee 401(k) Retirement Plan
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Corporation
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?