Bell v. Frost et al
Plaintiff: Richard N. Bell
Defendant: Roberts Brothers, Inc. and Sandy Frost
Case Number: 1:2019cv00230
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard N. Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Facts and Law, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Richard N. Bell) (Jarvis, Adam)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 filed by Roberts Brothers, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #15 Disclosure Statement filed by Roberts Brothers, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/1/2019. (ctn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Sandy Frost, Roberts Brothers, Inc.. (Schwant, Troy)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Roberts Brothers, Inc., HomeServices of America, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HomeServices of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Roberts Brothers, Inc... (Schwant, Troy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sandy Frost, Roberts Brothers, Inc.. (Schwant, Troy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Remark: Mailed Form AO-121 to Copyright Office on 06/26/2019 (nah)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certified Mail by Richard N. Bell. Roberts Brothers, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Jarvis, Adam)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certified Mail by Richard N. Bell. Sandy Frost served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Jarvis, Adam)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Richard N. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and terminating the #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in light of the withdrawal. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to refund Richard N. Bell the $75 pro hac vice filing fee paid with the #7 motion and to administratively terminate him as counsel of record for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/14/2019. (ctn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Richard N. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2411245, Online Credit Card Payment.), #8 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, by Richard N. Bell. (Bell, Richard)
June 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Richard N. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: #7 MOTION for Richard N. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion will be denied as unnecessary, unless attorney Bell files notice with the Court no later than 6/19/2019, indicating that he is not the Plaintiff named in the complaint. Assuming that Bell is the Plaintiff in this action, he is ORDERED to file, no later than 6/26/2019, a brief showing cause why he should be permitted to proceed with hybrid representation in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/12/2019. (nah) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/13/2019 to correct clerical error) (nah)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Richard N. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2411245, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Richard N. Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit B-In re Bell, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bell, Richard)
June 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Richard N. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Service Notice entered 5/13/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/24/2019. (srr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sandy Frost, Roberts Brothers, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (Attachments: #1 summons Roberts Bros) (srr)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Richard N. Bell for Sandy Frost (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons) (Jarvis, Adam)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandy Frost, Roberts Brothers, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2397804, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Richard N. Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C) (Jarvis, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Frost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Troy Thomas Schwant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Frost
Represented By: Troy Thomas Schwant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard N. Bell
Represented By: Adam Keith Jarvis
Represented By: Richard N Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?