Sullivan v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Willie Sullivan
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00234
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #17 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and otherwise the motion is moot. A preliminary scheduling order will not be entered until, if necessary, after the pending Motion to Dismiss has been ruled on. Otherwise, the Motion is moot since discovery can not commence until after the parties hold their Rule 26(f) scheduling conference, which they have not. The date by which they are to hold such a conference and file their Rule 26(f) report will be set if and when a preliminary scheduling order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/9/2019. (Milling, Bert)
July 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Stay Rule 26 and Discovery Deadlines - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tgw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Rule 26 and Discovery Deadlines by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Friedman, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting the #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the #10 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/22/2019, Replies due by 7/29/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/3/2019. (tgw)
July 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Judge Steele (tgw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Willie Sullivan. (Underwood, Earl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Steele, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Milling, Bert)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, WFC Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent WFC Holdings Corporation for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Friedman, Rachel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re #10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his response to motion by 7/8/2019. Defendant is ORDERED to file his reply by 7/15/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 7/15/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 06/25/2019. (srd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Friedman, Rachel)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/10/2019. (Steele, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
June 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Friedman, Rachel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl P. Underwood, Jr on behalf of Willie Sullivan (Underwood, Earl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Sullivan. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019 (Riemer, Kenneth)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 5/15/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/28/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/15/2019. (skb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (skb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Willie Sullivan (Riemer, Kenneth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2398999, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Willie Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Riemer, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rachel Ross Friedman
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Sullivan
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?