Donovan v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gary E. Donovan
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00257
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary E. Donovan. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Crump, Judson)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 6/17/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/17/19. (mpp)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Experian, #2 Summons Transunion, #3 Summons Equifax) (mpp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Gary E. Donovan of plan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Experian, #2 Proposed Summons for Trans Union, #3 Proposed Summons for Equifax) (Crump, Judson)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp) Copy to counsel
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Gary E. Donovan of plan (Attachments: #1 Experian Summons, #2 Trans Union Summons, #3 Equifax Summons) (Crump, Judson)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BALSDC-2408887, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Gary E. Donovan. Attachment # 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Crump, Judson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donovan v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary E. Donovan
Represented By: Judson Eric Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?