Sparta Insurance Company v. Guardian Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sparta Insurance Company
Defendant: Steven Marcrum, The Terminix International Company, LP, Everest National Insurance Company, Guardian Services, Inc., Terminix International Inc., Jason Outlaw and Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00260
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 REFERRAL OF #29 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
July 31, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion #17 filed by Jason Outlaw. (Campbell, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Scottsdale Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company d/b/a Nationwide E&S Specialty identifying Corporate Parent Scottsdale Insurance Company d/b/a Nationwide E&S Specialty for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Wood, Alex)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Abstension Doctrine filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Plaintiff and any other interested parties are ORDERED to file a response by 8/16/2019 and Defendant shall file a reply by 8/23/2019 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/29/2019. (srd)
July 26, 2019 REFERRAL OF #26 Response in Opposition to #17 Motion to Dismiss by Jason Outlaw to Judge Moorer. (mab)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Outlaw filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Doty, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company; Disclosure Statement Due 8/1/2019. (tot)
July 25, 2019 REFERRAL OF #24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Abstension Doctrine to Judge Moorer. (tot)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a)(2) and 12(b)(6) and Abstension Doctrine filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Wood, Alex)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #21 Disclosure Statement filed by Terminix International Inc. and the Terminix International Company, LP. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/11/2019. (ctn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Scottsdale Insurance Company by Sparta Insurance Company. Scottsdale Insurance Company served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019 (Doty, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP. (Gibson, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP. (Gibson, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order re: #15 Preliminary Scheduling Order. The requirements of FRCP 26(f) are SUSPENDED pending the Court's determination on the motion to dismiss as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/3/19. (tot)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jason Outlaw. Plf & any other interested party shall file responses on or before 7/26/2019. Dft Outlaw shall have until 8/2/2019 to file any reply it wishes to file. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/3/19. (tot)
July 3, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Jason Outlaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Campbell, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #14 Disclosure Statement filed by Everest National Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/28/2019. (ctn)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/28/19. (Attachment: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (tot)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Everest National Insurance Company, Everest Re Group, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Everest Re Group, Ltd. for Everest National Insurance Company.. (Lieb, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Everest National Insurance Company. (Lieb, Jonathan) Modified on 6/28/2019 (tot).
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Scottsdale Insurance Company. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 24, 2019 Answer due from Everest National Insurance Company, Guardian Services, Inc., Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP, pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(3). (tot)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Sparta Insurance Company on Scottsdale Insurance Company (Doty, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Scottsdale Insurance Company, filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Doty, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Jason Outlaw by Sparta Insurance Company. Jason Outlaw served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019 (Doty, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sparta Insurance Company. Everest National Insurance Company served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Doty, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed on The Terminix International Co., LP by Sparta Insurance Company. The Terminix International Company, LP served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Doty, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Terminix International, Inc. by Sparta Insurance Company. Terminix International Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Doty, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Sparta Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/6/2019. (ctn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Everest National Insurance Company, Guardian Services, Inc., Steven Marcrum, Jason Outlaw, Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Sparta Insurance Company (Doty, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Sparta Insurance Company, Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd Group identifying Corporate Parent Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd Group for Sparta Insurance Company.. (Doty, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Everest National Insurance Company, Guardian Services, Inc., Steven Marcrum, Jason Outlaw, Terminix International Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2407978, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Sparta Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Doty, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparta Insurance Company v. Guardian Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparta Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J Doty
Represented By: Carol Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Marcrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, LP
Represented By: James W. Gibson
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lieb
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminix International Inc.
Represented By: James W. Gibson
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Outlaw
Represented By: Thomas F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex Terry Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?