Buckley v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Airiel Joy Buckley
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00263
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IV, served 6/17/19 (per USPO website). (tot)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Nancy Berryhill; U.S. Attny served on 6/13/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (tot)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/12/2019. (copy to U.S. Attny w/summons on 6/12/2019) (skb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (SSA, U.S. Attny Gen, & U.S. Attny). (skb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (skb).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 the amended Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Plaintiff Airiel Joy Buckley on the grounds that her motion shows that (1) she is unable to pay the costs of commencing this action and (2) the action, being an appeal from the denial of social security benefits, is not frivolous or malicious. See Boubonis v. Chater, 957 F. Supp. 1071, 1072 (E.D. Wis. 1997) (citing 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) & (e)(2)(B)(i)). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/10/19. (lto)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees in light of the filing of #4 her amended motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/10/19. (lto)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Airiel Joy Buckley. (Holland, Laura)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re: Plf's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plf is to either pay the filing fee or to fully complete the Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form on or before 6/20/2019 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/7/19. (tot)
June 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tot)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Airiel J. Buckley. (Holland, Laura)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Airiel J. Buckley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Holland, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airiel Joy Buckley
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?