Spears v. Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William M. Spears, Jr.
Defendant: Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr. and Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00269
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 9/2/2019 (Defendants); by 9/28/2019 (Plaintiff). Position Regarding Settlement due by 10/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge) (eec)
August 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Scheduling Conference (by telephone) held on 8/1/2019. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 3A). (eec)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #2 MOTION for Scheduling Conference Before Entry of the Court's Standard FLSA 16(B) Scheduling Order filed by William M. Spears, Jr. (Preliminary Scheduling Conference, by telephone, set for 8/1/2019 02:00 PM ). To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/23/2019. (eec)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr. (Reese, Kelly)
June 26, 2019 Answer due from Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (eec)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers are due from All Defendants no later than July 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/26/19. (Cassady, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr. (Reese, Kelly)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D. Reese on behalf of Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr (Reese, Kelly)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William M. Spears, Jr. Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Rick Patel served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Rick Patel, Jr served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Rosenthal, Ian)
June 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Scheduling Conference Before Entry of the Court's Standard FLSA 16(B) Scheduling Order . Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (eec)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Scheduling Conference Before Entry of the Court's Standard FLSA 16(B) Scheduling Order by William M. Spears, Jr. (Rosenthal, Ian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, Rick Patel, Rick Patel, Jr ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2410874, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by William M. Spears, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons: Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC, #2 Summons: Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC, #3 Summons: Rick Patel, #4 Summons: Rick Patel, Jr.) (Rosenthal, Ian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Inn & Suites Foley, LLC
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Patel
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Patel, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Inn & Suites Loxley, LLC
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. Spears, Jr.
Represented By: Ian David Rosenthal
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?