The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Clemons Marketing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Zero RPM, Inc., Michael Shawn Clemons, Leaf Marine Distribution, LLC and Clemons Marketing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00271
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Closing pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of dismissal (srr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Stay, in light of #11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/29/2019. (ctn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Travelers Indemnity Company (Isenberg, Joel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Stay filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Isenberg, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #8 MOTION to Stay filed by Zero RPM, Inc., Responses due by 7/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/3/19. (srr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Zero RPM, Inc.. (Rowe, Benjamen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamen T. Rowe on behalf of Zero RPM, Inc. (Rowe, Benjamen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Certified Mail Return Receipt) by The Travelers Indemnity Company. Zero RPM, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Isenberg, Joel)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on Disclosure Statement filed by the Travelers Indemnity Company (Doc. 1-2). A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/10/2019. (ctn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Service Notice entered 6/10/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 7/22/2019. (srr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Shawn Clemons, Clemons Marketing, LLC, Leaf Marine Distribution, LLC, Zero RPM, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Leaf Marine, #2 Summons Michael Clemons, #3 Summons Zero RPM) (srr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2411596, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statment, #3 Exhibit Summons-Clemons Marketing, #4 Exhibit Summons-Leaf Marine Distribution, #5 Exhibit Summons-Michael Shawn Clemons, #6 Exhibit Summons-Zero RPM) (Isenberg, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Clemons Marketing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zero RPM, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamen T. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shawn Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leaf Marine Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemons Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Seth Tyler Hunter
Represented By: Joel S. Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?