Weatherby v. The Terminix International Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Weatherby
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00275
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Reply to 7 Weatherby's Response to the Court's June 24, 2019 Show Cause Order to Judge Moorer. (mab)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to #7 Weatherby's Response to the Court's June 24, 2019 Show Cause Order filed by The Terminix International Company, Inc. (clr)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Weatherby's Response to the Court's June 24, 2019 Show Cause Order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/24/2019. The Court will take their reply under submission. (clr)
July 24, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Weatherbys #7 Response to the Courts June 24, 2019 Show Cause Order Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Weatherbys Response to the Courts June 24, 2019 Show Cause Order by The Terminix International Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Terminix's Reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cox, Haley)
July 16, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Response to #5 Appellants' Motion to Remand re: #6 Order to Show Cause to Judge Moorer. (mab)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Appellants' Motion to Remand re: #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by Patricia Weatherby. (Campbell, Thomas) Modified on 7/16/2019 (mab).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Appellant's #5 Motion to Remand. Appellee is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by July 16, 2019, why the Court should not remand this matter to the state circuit court. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 06/24/2019. (mab)
June 24, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by The Terminix International Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A arbitration provision) (Cox, Haley)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Terminix International Company, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/21/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Terminix International Company, Inc.. (Cox, Haley)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Blank Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to Defendant The Terminix International Company, Inc.; Disclosure Statement Due 6/19/2019. (mab)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Patricia Weatherby from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 2019-000063 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Campbell, Thomas) Modified on 6/12/2019 (mab). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherby v. The Terminix International Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Bell
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Weatherby
Represented By: Thomas F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?