Shepherd v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Alice Shepherd
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00292
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice Shepherd. (Thomas, Ashley)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice Shepherd. (Thomas, Ashley)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice Shepherd. Nancy Berryhill served on 6/20/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Thomas, Ashley)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 06/19/2019. (skb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (Attny Gen of the United States, U.S. Attny, & SSA). Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (skb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2416408, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Alice Shepherd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Shepherd
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?