Arkema Inc. et al v. Emerson Process Management, LLLP et al
Plaintiff: Arkema France and Arkema Inc.
Defendant: Nilesh Chaudhari and Emerson Process Management, LLLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00296
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #30 Response in Support of Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Emerson Process Management LLLP's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Emerson Process Management, LLLP. (South, Clinton)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (skb)
July 30, 2019 REFERRAL OF #28 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arkema France, Arkema Inc.. (Pease, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Plaintiffs Arkema France and Arkema Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Arkema France; Arkema Inc. (Steele, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Arkema France, Arkema Inc., Arkema S.A., Arkema S.A. identifying Other Affiliate Arkema S.A. for Arkema France, Arkema Inc... (Pease, John)
July 21, 2019 Filing 24 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Emerson Process Management, LLP. (Steele, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Defendant Emerson Process Management, LLLP, reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Emerson Process Management, LLLP. (South, Clinton)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Emerson Process Management, LLLP. Plaintiff responses due by 7/29/2019. Defendant reply due by 8/5/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 8/5/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/15/2019. (nah)
July 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Steele (nah)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Emerson Process Management, LLLP. (South, Clinton)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Peck on behalf of Emerson Process Management, LLLP (Peck, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Keith Essig on behalf of Emerson Process Management, LLLP (Essig, Brandon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Ray South on behalf of Emerson Process Management, LLLP (South, Clinton)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkema Inc., Arkema France. Emerson Process Management, LLLP served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 (Banks, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Emerson Process Management, LLLP. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Rachel H. Stinson). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/19/2019. (eec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Rachel H. Stinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2418184, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Arkema France, Arkema Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stinson, Rachel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Nilesh Chaudhari, Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) Modified on 6/19/2019 (eec).
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document (See order for further details.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/18/2019. (eec)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Michael L. Banks). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/18/2019. (eec)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John J. Pease, III). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/18/2019. (eec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Michael L. Banks to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2417560, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Arkema France, Arkema Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Banks, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for John J. Pease III to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2417304, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Arkema France, Arkema Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Pease, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to Seal Document by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Reeves, Archibald)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs Summons to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons to Emerson) (Reeves, Archibald)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2417240, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Reeves, Archibald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkema Inc. et al v. Emerson Process Management, LLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilesh Chaudhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Process Management, LLLP
Represented By: Clinton Ray South
Represented By: Adam K. Peck
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkema France
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Represented By: John J. Pease, III
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Hope Stinson
Represented By: Michael L. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkema Inc.
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Represented By: John J. Pease, III
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Hope Stinson
Represented By: Michael L. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?