Murray v. Thornton
Plaintiff: Raymond Murray
Defendant: Shane Thornton
Case Number: 1:2019cv00300
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Notice (Other) #6 filed by Raymond Murray (APG)
August 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Notice of Service Attempt to Judge Granade. (tot)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Raymond Murray of service attempt (Sherrod, Henry)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order, on or before 8/13/2019, Plf is to file his notice of service attempt as to the Dft, or show cause, by said date, why he has not complied with the Court's Local Rule. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/6/19. (tot)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Service Notice entered 6/20/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/5/2019. (tot)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shane Thornton. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Raymond Murray (Sherrod, Henry)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shane Thornton ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2418364, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Raymond Murray. (Sherrod, Henry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Murray
Represented By: Henry F. Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?