Tompkins v. J&E Collections, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tommy Tompkins and Tommy J. Tompkins, Jr.
Defendant: JE Group, Inc., J&E Collections, Inc. and JE Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00312
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to J&E Collections, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Dismiss JE Groups, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against JE Groups, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 08/09/2019. (mab)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tommy J. Tompkins, Jr (Crump, Judson)
August 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss JE Groups, Inc. Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss JE Groups, Inc. filed by Tommy J. Tompkins, Jr. (Crump, Judson)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against J&E Collections, Inc., filed by Tommy J. Tompkins, Jr. (Crump, Judson)
July 3, 2019 Answer due from JE Group Incorporated pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (tot)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tommy J. Tompkins, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Crump, Judson)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Service Notice entered 6/24/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/8/2019. (tot) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/24/2019) (tot).
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JE Group Incorporated. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tommy Tompkins (Crump, Judson)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JE Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BALSDC-2420187, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Tommy Tompkins. (Crump, Judson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tompkins v. J&E Collections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Tompkins
Represented By: Judson Eric Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy J. Tompkins, Jr.
Represented By: Judson Eric Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&E Collections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JE Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?