Bryan v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Amy Lee Bryan
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00314
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amy Lee Bryan. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Brandt, Christine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Service Notice entered 7/25/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 8/8/2019. (srr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Amy Lee Bryan. (Brandt, Christine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of filing Proposed Summons by Amy Lee Bryan as to Monsanto Company. (Brandt, Christine) Modified on 7/25/2019 (srr).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2420527, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Amy Lee Bryan. (Brandt, Christine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lee Bryan
Represented By: Christine C. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?