Horn v. Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronshay Horn
Defendant: Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc. and Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc., Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC (Milling, Bert)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due from Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC on 9/6/2019; Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc. on 9/6/2019 pursuant to FRCP 12(a). Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/7/2019. (tgw)
August 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to Judge Steele (tgw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc., Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC. (Steele, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC, Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc.. (Davis, Thomas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Davis, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 7/2/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/15/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/2/2019. (tgw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC, Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2424680, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Ronshay Horn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons AGR, #4 Summons GW) (Chestnut, Prince)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee & Wyoming Railway Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama & Gulf Coast RY, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronshay Horn
Represented By: Prince Darius Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?