Dennis v. Saul

Plaintiff: Martha Dennis
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00331
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 07/12/2019 as to Social Security Administration (nah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney's Office served on 7/10/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (nah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Wiseman, Holly)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/9/2019. (tgw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (tgw)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to serve the defendant. The #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/8/2019. (tgw)
July 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Martha Dennis. (Thomas, Ashley)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order directing Plaintiff to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an amended IFP motion by 7/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/3/2019. (tgw)
July 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tgw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Martha Dennis. (Thomas, Ashley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Martha Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Thomas, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Dennis
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?