SLF Holdings, LLC v. Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SLF Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Uniti Group, Inc., Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Kenneth Gunderman and John P. Fletcher
Case Number: 1:2019cv00333
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/28/2019 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins, CRR, RMR, Telephone number 251-690-3371. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Notice of Transcript Redaction to be filed by 9/20/2019. Redaction Request due 9/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2019. (maw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/30/2019. (nah)
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2019 re #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. Motion is TUS. Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. (tgw)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/28/2019. (DuBose, Kristi)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #34 Corrected MOTION to Transfer. Plaintiffs Response due by 9/10/2019; Defendants Reply due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/27/2019. (nah)
August 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #36 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Record (Chris Gleno's Declaration - Doc. 29-3) to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Supplement Record (Chris Gleno's Declaration - Doc. 29-3) filed by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (MacKenzie, Robert) Modified on 8/27/2019 (nah).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #33 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/27/2019. (DuBose, Kristi)
August 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #34 Corrected MOTION to Transfer Defendants' Corrected Motion to Transfer to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 34 Corrected MOTION to Transfer Defendants' Corrected Motion to Transfer filed by Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Betbeze, Jaime)
August 26, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #33 MOTION to Transfer Defendants' Motion to Transfer to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Transfer Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Betbeze, Jaime)
August 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #31 Reply and #32 Notice of Filing, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. re #31 Reply, #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Kelly A. McGriff in Support of Motion to Disqualify) (Betbeze, Jaime)
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Reply in Support of Uniti Fiber Holdings Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify filed by Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Betbeze, Jaime)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime W. Betbeze on behalf of Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc. (Betbeze, Jaime)
August 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge DuBose. (nah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (MacKenzie, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Warren Butler on behalf of Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (Butler, M.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibit A, Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement of SLF Holdings, LLC, and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on Uniti Group, Inc. on 07/18/2019, filed by SLF Holdings, LLC. (Sledge, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibit A, Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement of SLF Holdings, LLC, and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. on 07/18/2019, filed by SLF Holdings, LLC. (Sledge, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibit A, Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement of SLF Holdings, LLC, and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on John P. Fletcher on 07/22/2019, filed by SLF Holdings, LLC. (Sledge, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SLF Holdings, LLC. Uniti Group, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019 (Sledge, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SLF Holdings, LLC. Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019 (Sledge, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SLF Holdings, LLC. John P. Fletcher served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019 (Sledge, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Defendants within 21 days after the Court's resolution of the motion to disqualify #13 . Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/9/19. (gcp)
August 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc.. (Burkhalter, Carl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S. Holifield on behalf of John P. Fletcher (Holifield, Jennifer)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome E. Speegle on behalf of John P. Fletcher (Speegle, Jerome)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl S. Burkhalter on behalf of Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc. (Burkhalter, Carl)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Stephen Wright Still, Jr. on behalf of Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (nah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Robert P. MacKenzie, III on behalf of Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP (nah)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re: #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 8/14/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/05/2019. (nah)
August 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel Kelly A. McGriff with Exhibits A-K.) (Cassady, Max)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselors Edmund Polubinski, III and Brian Marc Burnovski, as members in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, and who have complied with the rules of this Court, be and are hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/31/19. (Cassady, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brian M. Burnovski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2441693, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc.. (Burnovski, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION and APPLICATION for Edmund Polubinski III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2441638, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Kenneth Gunderman, Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc.. (Polubinski, Edmund)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Cassady, Jr on behalf of Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc., Uniti Group, Inc. (Cassady, Max)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Cassady, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Cassady, Max)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 filed by SLF Holdings, LLC (Cassady, William)
July 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, to Judge William E. Cassady. (eec)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued (Summons Fletcher). Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service: #1 Summons Gunderman, #2 Summons Fiber Holdings, #3 Summons Unti Group) (eec). Modified on 7/8/2019 (eec).
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by SLF Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement ) (Sledge, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs SLF Holdings, LLC, Andy Newton, Gerald L. Wallace, Jr., Rodney A. Pilot, Davis W. Pilot, Celia A. Wallace, Teaghlach, Inc., Eric Daniels, Paul E Bullington, Curtis F Pilot identifying Other Affiliate Andy Newton, Other Affiliate Teaghlach, Inc., Other Affiliate Paul E Bullington, Other Affiliate Curtis F Pilot, Other Affiliate Gerald L. Wallace, Jr., Other Affiliate Celia A. Wallace, Other Affiliate Rodney A. Pilot, Other Affiliate Davis W. Pilot, Other Affiliate Eric Daniels for SLF Holdings, LLC.. (Sledge, Edward)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2425934, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by SLF Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sledge, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLF Holdings, LLC v. Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Edward S. Sledge, IV
Represented By: Zachary A Madonia
Represented By: Emily Myers Ruzic
Represented By: Dylan Cook Black
Represented By: Stanley Edward Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniti Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Burnovski
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Carl S. Burkhalter
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniti Fiber Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Burnovski
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Carl S. Burkhalter
Represented By: Max Cassady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Gunderman
Represented By: Brian Burnovski
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Carl S. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Fletcher
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?