United States of America v. Crenshaw et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: SMS Financial XV, LLC, Coastal States Developmnt, LLC, Jeannine C. Larson and Curtis A. Crenshaw
Case Number: 1:2019cv00334
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Coastal States Development, LLC by United States of America. (Carroll, Allison)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeannine C. Larson by United States of America. (Carroll, Allison)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Curtis A. Crenshaw by United States of America. (Carroll, Allison)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Coastal States Developmnt, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Curtis A. Crenshaw served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Jeannine C. Larson served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed) (Carroll, Allison)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Notice (Other) #7 filed by United States of America, Notice (Other) #8 filed by United States of America. (jil)
August 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Notice (Other) and #8 Notice (Other) to Judge Beaverstock. (srd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America re #5 Waiver of Service Executed of Withdrawal (Carroll, Allison)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Service Order (Carroll, Allison)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. SMS Financial XV, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Carroll, Allison)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jeannine C. Larson waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Carroll, Allison)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Cecile Carroll on behalf of United States of America (Carroll, Allison)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 7/8/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/8/2019. (tgw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Coastal States Developmnt, LLC, Curtis A. Crenshaw, Jeannine C. Larson, SMS Financial XV, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Curtis Crenshaw, #3 Proposed Summons for Coastal States Development, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons for Jeannine Larson, #5 Proposed Summons for SMS Financial XV, LLC) (May, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crenshaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Financial XV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal States Developmnt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannine C. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis A. Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael May
Represented By: Allison Cecile Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?