Beacon Maritime, Inc. et al v. Heavy Lift VB-10,000 et al
Plaintiff: Better Gold Enterprises, LLC and Beacon Maritime, Inc.
Defendant: Versabuild, LLC, Versabar, Inc., Versamarine, LLC and Heavy Lift VB-10,000
Case Number: 1:2019cv00336
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beacon Maritime, Inc.. Versabar, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 29, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beacon Maritime, Inc.. Versabuild, LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 29, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beacon Maritime, Inc.. Versamarine, LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 Service Notice entered 8/19/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 10/3/2019. (srr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Versabar, Inc., Versabuild, LLC, Versamarine, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (Attachments: #1 summons Versabuild, #2 summons Versamarine) (srr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #15 Disclosure Statement filed by Beacon Maritime, Inc. & #21 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/5/2019. (ctn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Crutchfield, Blane) Modified on 8/5/2019 (eec).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Disclosure Statement. The Deadline for Better Gold Enterprises, LLC to comply with the Court's 7/23/2019 Order (Doc. 16) is hereby extended to Friday, 8/9/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/02/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Disclosure Statement. The deadline for Better Gold Enterprises, LLC to comply with the Court's 7/23/2019 Order #16 is hereby extended to Thurs. 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/1/2019. (ctn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order that Better Gold is to file by 7/30/19 an amended Disclosure Statement or certification by Better Gold's counsel that, based upon reasonable investigation, its initial disclosures is correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/23/19. (srr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Beacon Maritime, Inc.. (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Beacon Maritime, Inc. and Better Gold Enterprises, LLC are each ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Tues. 7/23/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/16/2019. (ctn)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: #11 Request for Release of Vessel filed by Better Gold Enterprises, LLC, Beacon Maritime, Inc. The vessel Heavy Lift VB-10,000, including her engines, tackle, apparel, is hereby RELEASED from arrest, provided that the U.S. Marshal "shall not deliver [the Vessel] until the costs and charges of the officers of the court shall first have been paid". Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/15/19. copies to USM (srr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Release of Vessel filed by Plaintiffs Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion to Appoint Custodian as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/10/2019. (srd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Affirmation of Appointment as Substitute Custodian) (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Admiralty Warrant Issued as to Heavy Lift VB-10,000. (copies to USM) (srr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC re #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/9/19. (srr) Modified on 7/9/2019 (srr).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem; Clerk is directed to issue a warrant for the arrest of the defendant Heavy Lift VB-10,000 and deliver warrant to the United States Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/9/19. (srr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of Appointment of Sub Custodian, #2 Exhibit Certificate of liability Insurance) (Crutchfield, Blane)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #2 Warrant) (srd).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heavy Lift VB-10,000, Versabar, Inc., Versabuild, LLC, Versamarine, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2427070, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Beacon Maritime, Inc., Better Gold Enterprises, LLC. (Crutchfield, Blane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacon Maritime, Inc. et al v. Heavy Lift VB-10,000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Gold Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beacon Maritime, Inc.
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versabuild, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versabar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versamarine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Lift VB-10,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?