McCorvey v. Lalita, LLC

Plaintiff: Candace McCorvey
Defendant: Lalita, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00338
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lalita, LLC Referred to Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (eec)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lalita, LLC filed by Candace McCorvey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rocco Calamusa, Jr.) (Calamusa, Rocco)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace McCorvey. Lalita, LLC served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 (Calamusa, Rocco)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lalita, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Candace McCorvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (Calamusa, Rocco)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lalita, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2426985, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Candace McCorvey. (Calamusa, Rocco) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCorvey v. Lalita, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalita, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace McCorvey
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?