Nelson v. Gerber Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wynonna Angelyn Nelson
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00340
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kriston Laney gifford on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company (gifford, Kriston)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Conference (by telephone) RESCHEDULED for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/3/2019. (eec)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: 7 Order. Scheduling Conference (by telephone) RESCHEDULED for 9/5/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/29/2019. (eec)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company, Scheduling Conference (by telephone) set for 9/3/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/26/2019. (eec)
August 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (cmj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Walters, Jason)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company (Cassady, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Gerber Life Insurance Company, Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. for Gerber Life Insurance Company.. (Walters, Jason)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gerber Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number 02-CV-2019-900006. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2427576, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index to State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint and Written Discovery, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Answer and Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit F - Answer to Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit G - Motion to Dismiss/Strike, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit I - Proposed Order on Motion to Strike, #10 Exhibit J - Order Granting Motion to Strike, #11 Exhibit K - Motion for Protective Order, #12 Exhibit L - Interim Order, #13 Exhibit M - Proposed Protective Order, #14 Exhibit N - Protective Order, #15 Exhibit O - Motion to Withdraw, #16 Exhibit P - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #17 Exhibit Q - Settlement Demand, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walters, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Gerber Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Allen Walters
Represented By: Kriston Laney gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynonna Angelyn Nelson
Represented By: Mark C. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?