Nicholson v. RB2, LLC
Plaintiff: Mechelle Nicholson
Defendant: RB2, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00344
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mechelle Nicholson. RB2, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 (Calamusa, Rocco)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RB2, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mechelle Nicholson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (Calamusa, Rocco)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RB2, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2428992, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mechelle Nicholson. (Calamusa, Rocco) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. RB2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechelle Nicholson
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?