Scott v. Road King Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason L. Scott
Defendant: Javier P. Delgado and Road King Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00374
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/1/2019. (tgw)
August 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Steele. (tgw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason L. Scott (Braswell, Kasie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Road King Transportation, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jason L. Scott (Braswell, Kasie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Javier P. Delgado, Road King Transportation, LLC, filed by Jason L. Scott. (Braswell, Kasie)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to file, on or before 7/24/2019, an amended complaint that adequately sets forth the basis of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/17/2019. (nah)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 7/16/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/29/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 07/16/2019. (nah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Javier P. Delgado, Road King Transportation, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Jason L. Scott (Braswell, Kasie) Modified on 7/16/2019 (nah).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Javier P. Delgado, Road King Transportation, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2431352, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jason L. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's 1st Interrogatories to Road King, #2 Supplement Plaintiff's 1st Request for Production to Road King, #3 Supplement Plaintiff's 1st Interrogatories to Javier Delgado, #4 Supplement Plaintiff's 1st Request for Production to Javier Delgado) (Braswell, Kasie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Road King Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier P. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road King Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Scott
Represented By: D. Brian Murphy
Represented By: Kasie M. Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?