Greenlee v. Acima Credit, LLC
Plaintiff: William Greenlee and William H. Greenlee
Defendant: Acima Credit, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00378
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #10 Notice of Settlement filed by Acima Credit, LLC. Greenlee shall file any objection on or before 8/30/2019. If no objection is filed, then the action is DISMISSED with prejudice subject to the right of any party to reinstate the action within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order should the settlement agreement not be completed. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/22/2019. (nah)
August 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Notice of Settlement to Judge DuBose. (nah)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Acima Credit, LLC (Miller, Zachary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Riemer on behalf of William H. Greenlee (Riemer, Kenneth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Under Seal filed by Acima Credit, LLC. (Johnson, Taylor) Modified on 7/26/2019 (mcb).
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Barr Johnson on behalf of Acima Credit, LLC (Johnson, Taylor)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Acima to file, no later than 7/26/2019, an amended disclosure statement as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/19/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (nah)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 07/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Acima Credit, LLC. (Miller, Zachary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Acima Credit, LLC. (Miller, Zachary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Acima Credit, LLC from Small Claims Baldwin County, case number SM-2019-902006. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2432419, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Acima Credit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Miller, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenlee v. Acima Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acima Credit, LLC
Represented By: Zachary David Miller
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Greenlee
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?